Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Don Henry, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Thomas Caudill, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 1991 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - CAUDILL, LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS CAUDILL, THOMAS 1025 NORTH FOURTH STREET SAN JOSE, CA 95112-4942 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
April 21, 1992 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
December 02, 1991 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISMISSAL WP ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THOMAS CAUDILL Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
September 27, 1991 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
September 27, 1991 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description CMC COMPLAINT BY THOMAS CAUDILL Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.