Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sharon Boardman, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sheldon R. Blum, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 1991 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - BLUM, SHELDON R. BLUM, SHELDON R. 2242 CAMDEN AVE., SUITE 201 SAN JOSE, CA 95124 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 10, 1991 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
August 28, 1991 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISM W/PREJ ENTIRE ACTION BY SHELDON BLUM Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
July 16, 1991 | Docket Event |
Order Text = MOTION Description ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR SERVICE UP TO 60DAYS FROM TODAY SIGNED HON. READ AMBLER Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 17, 1991 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
May 17, 1991 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description CMC COMPLAINT BY SHELDOM BLUM Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.