Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Linda Kaye Nelson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robert E Perez, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 1991 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - LEW, LAW OFFICE OF MARK LEW, MARK 3120 SPRINGVIEW LANE SAN JOSE, CA 95140-9716 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - PEREZ, ROBERT E. PEREZ, ROBERT E. 1416 THOMSNELL WAY CERES, CA 95307-9659 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
July 30, 1992 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 4 |
|
July 09, 1992 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISMISSAL WOP AS TO DEFT. VIRGINIO FORTINO DOMINGUEZ & DOES 1-100 ONLY BY W. GOOCH Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 21, 1992 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 4 |
|
March 17, 1992 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 4 |
|
March 17, 1992 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description JUDGMENT ON STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PER JUDGE FOGEL Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 03, 1992 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 4 |
|
February 04, 1992 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.