Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lance Electric Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 1991 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - CUMMINS JR., LAW OFFICE OF CHARLES F. CUMMINS JR., CHARLES F. 224 JACKSON STREET #B SAN JOSE, CA 95112-3201 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
July 21, 1992 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
June 02, 1992 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISMISSAL WOPE BY CHARLES CUMMINS Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 26, 1991 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description CMC COMPLAINT FILED BY CHARLES CUMMINS JR. Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 23, 1991 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.