Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Anahid Henesian, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Jodi Lynn Beloff, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 1992 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - CHERNICK, LAW OFFICES OF CLIFFORD ROSS BELOFF, JODI L. 770 MENLO AVE., SUITE 101 MENLO PARK, CA 94025 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - BABBITS & WALTER DWORKIN, REID L. 1999 HARRISON STREET STE. 2070 OAKLAND, CA 94612-3517 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
January 14, 1993 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 8 |
|
January 11, 1993 | Hearing |
Hearing: Motion hearings
Judge: Department 8 |
|
November 19, 1992 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISM W/PRJ ENTIRE ACTION BY JODI BELOFF Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
November 19, 1992 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISM (CONT) BY NANCY WALTER Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
November 19, 1992 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISM W/PREJ S TO XCOMPL OF LEEWARDS CREATIVE CRAFTS INC AS AGAINST CJ OLSON & DOES I-XXV-- Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
November 18, 1992 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISM W/PREJ ENTIRE ACTION BY JODI BELOFF EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS & FEES Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
November 05, 1992 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISMISSAL WP AS TO X-COMPL OF C.J. OLSON VS LEEWARDS BY A. RAIGOZA Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.