Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jo Ellen Jordon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Unknown, against Gottdiner Inc., Servicemaster Company, represented by Robert C Keeney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 1992 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - IMAI TADLOCK KEENEY & CORDERY LLP KEENEY, ROBERT C. 185 BERRY STREET., SUITE 4300 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94107 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - HIRSHON, JACK T. P.O. BOX 5126 TAHOE CITY, CA 96145-5126 (408) 280-6767 Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - HS LAW GROUP DIGESTI, RONALD D. 210 NO. FOURTH ST., SUITE 201 SAN JOSE, CA 95112 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
July 15, 1993 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 4 |
|
May 18, 1993 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISMISSAL WP AGAINST DEFT. XEROX CORP. ONLY BY JACK HIRSHON Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 14, 1993 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISMISSAL WPE BY JACK HIRSHON Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 04, 1993 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 4 |
|
March 02, 1993 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 4 |
|
February 24, 1993 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description ** CMC FILED 02/23/93;BY JACK T. HIRSHON, ESQ. Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.