Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bernard Dzambik, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gary B. Mitchell, against Wayne Kikuchi, City Of San Jose, Pacific Gas And Electric Co., represented by Joseph M Wojciechowski, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 1991 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - MITCHELL & WALWYN MITCHELL, GARY B. 110 NORTH THIRD ST. #2 SAN JOSE, CA 95112 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - SAN JOSE WOJCIECHOWSKI, JOSEPH M. 151 WEST MISSION STREET SAN JOSE, CA 95110 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
September 03, 1993 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description > REQUEST DISMISSAL (PARTIAL)X-COMPLT AGST PGE (J. WOJCIECHOWSKI) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
September 01, 1993 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description > REQUEST DISMISSAL (PARTIAL) W/O PREJ. AS TO DEFT. P.G.E. ONLY BY GARY B. MITCHELL Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
September 01, 1993 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Text = MOTION Description PROOF OF SERVICE/REG MAIL OF SUMMNS & X-CMPLNT AS TO WAYNE KIKUCHI ON 8/27/93 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
September 01, 1993 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Substituted Text = MOTION Description PROOF OF SUB SRVC OF SUMMONS & X-CMPLNT AS TO WAYNE KIKUCHI/ACTPD BY R. PRITCHARD 8/24/93 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
January 04, 1993 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description ** CMC FILED 1-4-93 ;BY LESLIE EBERHARDT STIP TO ARBITRATION Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 26, 1992 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description ** CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE BY J. WOJCIECHOWSKI FILED 6-23-92 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 23, 1992 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description NO CMC DATE ENTERED - CHECK & PUT IN CMC DATE 7-7-92 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.