Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Asli Nasrin, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kayhan Shin Shakib, against Walgreen Co, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 1990 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Limited (23) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 1992 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document Noted -- Comments. Description: Cmc Desk Holding Papers -File Not Locate Operator: DEK Fee: $0.00 Decision = M Closed = 09/09/1992 |
|
August 05, 1992 | Hearing |
Hearing: Motion hearings
Judge: OLD DEPT |
|
August 05, 1992 | Docket Event |
Motion: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Dismissal Hearing Decision = M Closed = 08/05/1992 |
|
December 24, 1990 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Complaint -- 23LT Personal Injury-Converted Legacy Document 1A. Dept: Unspecified, Operator: Fee: $0.00, Complaint: $0.00 Summons Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/24/1990 |
|
December 24, 1990 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.