Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
P John Mancuso, Vicki L Foronda, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2014 | Hearing | Hearing: Final Distribution | |
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order: Final Distribution Legacy Name = PR Ord:Final Distribution Decision = G Closed = 10/02/2014 |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = of Lisa Marie Foronda re: receipt Legacy Name = PR Declaration Decision = M Closed = 10/01/2014 |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = of personal rep re: fair market value Legacy Name = PR Declaration Decision = M Closed = 10/01/2014 |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = of P. JOhn Mancuso Legacy Name = PR Declaration Decision = M Closed = 10/01/2014 |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = of JOhn Mancuso in support request for compensation Legacy Name = PR Declaration Decision = M Closed = 10/01/2014 |
|
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing: Decedent's Estate/Trust Text = hrg 10/2/14 Legacy Name = PR Ntc of Hrg w/POS-Decedent's Est/Trust Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014 |
|
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition: Other Text = $465pd; ptr PJ Mancuso; Settlement of Account; Reimbursement of Costs and Allowance of Statutory and Extraordinary Compensation Legacy Name = PR Petn:Final Distribution Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014 |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Inventory and Appraisal Text = Partial No. 1, $245,000.00 Legacy Name = PR Inventory & Appraisement Decision = M Closed = 08/25/2014 |
|
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order: Appoint Probate Referee Legacy Name = PR Ord:Appt Probate Referee Decision = G Closed = 05/23/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.