Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
James Tonge, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gary C. Brustin, against Ramon Gregorio, represented by Nicholas Pastore, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 1990 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - BRUSTIN, LAW OFFICES OF GARY C. BRUSTIN, GARY C. 8383 WILSHIRE BLVD SUITE 919 BEVERLY HILLS, CA 90211 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - CAMPBELL WARBURTON FITZSIMMONS SMITH MENDELL & PAS PASTORE, NICHOLAS 111 W. ST. JOHN STREET SUITE 440 SAN JOSE, CA 95113 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
January 14, 1992 | Hearing |
Hearing: Motion hearings
Judge: Department 8 |
|
October 18, 1991 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description DISMISSAL WPE ACTION BY: GARY C. BRUSTIN . Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
September 17, 1991 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
August 28, 1991 | Hearing |
Review: Arbitration Order
Judge: OLD DEPT |
|
August 06, 1991 | Hearing |
Hearing: Motion hearings
Judge: OLD DEPT |
|
August 05, 1991 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description ** CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE BY GARY C. BRUSTIN FILED 8-5-91 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
August 05, 1991 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description ELECTION TO ARB: BY: GARY C. BRUSTIN Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.