Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pettis, Tester, Kruss & Krinsky, Huey & Hudson, Fox & Grove, Civil & Construction Consultants Inc., Best Homes & Investments Inc., (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 1993 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - MORRISON & FOERSTER - PALO ALTO WILSON, BRYAN J. 755 PAGE MILL RD PALO ALTO, CA 94304-1018 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 05, 1994 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 4 |
|
April 29, 1994 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description > REQUEST DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE BY JOHN BOONE Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 22, 1994 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management after mediation
Judge: Department 4 |
|
February 09, 1994 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Text = MOTION Description SUMMONS ISSUED ON X-COMP ATTY P.FLINN Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
February 07, 1994 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description * AWARD FILED 01/21/94 PLTFS CLAIM DENIED AWARD REJ BY PLTF 02/03/94 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
February 03, 1994 | Docket Event |
Rejection: Arbitration Award by Plt Text = MOTION Description REJECT ARB AWARD/REQUEST TRIAL DE NOVO BY PLAINTIFF Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
January 24, 1994 | Docket Event |
Award: Arbitrator in favor of Defendant Text = MOTION Description AWARD OF ARBITRATOR - PLAINTIFFS CLAIM DENIED DEFT AWARDED COSTS . Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 14, 1993 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = Result Text: 853 - AWARD OF ARB RECEIVED/FILED ARBITRATION HEARING DT PER STIP & ORDER (INFORMATION ONLY) Decision = M Closed = 01/24/1994 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.