Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Disparte Louis William, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Essex Property Corp., in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2001 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2001 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Certif Copies Of File To Da'S Office Operator: HD Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Entry Noted on Register Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2001 |
|
January 29, 1990 | Hearing | Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant | |
January 29, 1990 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Misrep. Breach & Fraud Heard By: Commissioner R. Stafford Department 31 Decision = M Closed = 01/29/1990 |
|
December 27, 1989 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Complaint -- SCMN Money-Converted Legacy Document 1A. Dept: Not Specified, Operator: Fee Amount: $0.00, Complaint Amount: $0.00 Party Military Status Not Specified Complaint Summons Not Issued Number of Additional Unidentified Persons Potentially Affected by Judgment: 01 Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 12/27/1989 |
|
December 27, 1989 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.