Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hewitt Michael, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Roberts James K, Roberts Leslie B, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 1997 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 1997 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- (Blank). Description: Case Purged Operator: MRF Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 02/13/1997 |
|
July 16, 1984 | Hearing |
Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant
Judge: Department 86 |
|
July 16, 1984 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Refund For Furniture Heard By: Pro Tem T. Lowman Department 27 Decision = M Closed = 07/16/1984 |
|
March 08, 1984 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Complaint -- SCMN Money-Converted Legacy Document 1A. Dept: Not Specified, Operator: Fee Amount: $0.00, Complaint Amount: $0.00 Party Military Status Not Specified Complaint Summons Not Issued Number of Additional Unidentified Persons Potentially Affected by Judgment: 01 Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 03/08/1984 |
|
March 08, 1984 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.