Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alexander James A, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Hooker Denis N, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 1983 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 1983 | Hearing |
Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant
Judge: Department 86 |
|
December 05, 1983 | Hearing |
Hearing: Motion hearings
Judge: Department 86 |
|
December 05, 1983 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: , Time: 03:00, Dept: 27, Operator: No ID Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 12/05/1983 |
|
December 05, 1983 | Docket Event |
Motion: Other Text = Heard By: Judge R. Lisk Department 27 Decision = M Closed = 12/05/1983 |
|
July 25, 1983 | Hearing |
Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant
Judge: Department 86 |
|
July 25, 1983 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Heard By: Pro Tem J. Heath Department 26 Decision = M Closed = 07/25/1983 |
|
April 04, 1983 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
April 04, 1983 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Complaint -- SCMN Money-Converted Legacy Document 1A. Dept: Not Specified, Operator: Fee Amount: $0.00, Complaint Amount: $0.00 Party Military Status Not Specified Complaint Summons Not Issued Number of Additional Unidentified Persons Potentially Affected by Judgment: 01 Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 04/04/1983 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.