Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Monnich, Mark Murphy, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2017 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Clear Case From DMV Reporting | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | DMV DE2 -Live FTA Release Abstract | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Further Proceedings | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear MSB | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Appear |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.