Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2022 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2023 |
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | SMITH, ET AL VS. PG&E CORPORATION, ET AL Case Number: 196313 This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of coordinated proceeding. On September 9, 2021, the Court issued an order setting t... | |
March 10, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | SMITH, ET AL VS. PG&E CORPORATION, ET AL Case Number: 196313 This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of coordinated proceeding. On September 9, 2021, the Court issued an order setting t... | |
March 09, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | SMITH, ET AL VS. PG&E CORPORATION, ET AL Case Number: 196313 This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of coordinated proceeding. On September 9, 2021, the Court issued an order setting t... | |
March 08, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | SMITH, ET AL VS. PG&E CORPORATION, ET AL Case Number: 196313 This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of coordinated proceeding. On September 9, 2021, the Court issued an order setting t... | |
March 07, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | SMITH, ET AL VS. PG&E CORPORATION, ET AL Case Number: 196313 This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of coordinated proceeding. On September 9, 2021, the Court issued an order setting t... | |
March 06, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | SMITH, ET AL VS. PG&E CORPORATION, ET AL Case Number: 196313 This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of coordinated proceeding. On September 9, 2021, the Court issued an order setting t... | |
March 05, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | SMITH, ET AL VS. PG&E CORPORATION, ET AL Case Number: 196313 This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of coordinated proceeding. On September 9, 2021, the Court issued an order setting t... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.