Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Longstreet, Brent M, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2015 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Bail Forfeiture | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Mandatory Court Appearance | |
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.