Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Sanchez, Everardo, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2015 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Traffic School Certificate Filed | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Traffic School Completed | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.