Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Gordley, Donshay Leroy, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2015 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Failure To Pay MSB Trial in Absentia | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Franchise Tax Board Court Ordered Debt Program | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Pay Abstract | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Pay | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay Letter | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Failure to Pay | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Decision Mailed | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Trial in Absentia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.