Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
Learnship Corporation, Learnship Networks Gmbh, Skyline Venture Partners Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Angell, Jason S., against Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Learnship Corporation, Learnship Networks Gmbh, represented by Zirogiannia, Lewis, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint concerns the intentional breach of a stock purchase agreement between Skyline Venture Partners LLC ("Skyline") and Learnship Corporation and Learnship Networks GmbH. The agreement required defendants to pay Skyline for its portion of t...
Summons Issued / Filed
Date: December 27, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 27, 2019Complaint
Date: December 27, 20192304710_Learnship_Defend_ment_2024_04_05_CMC_
Date: April 03, 2024Cross Complaint
Date: June 19, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: August 26, 2020Order
Date: August 28, 2020Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: February 24, 2020Answer (Unlimited)
Date: June 19, 2020Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: August 20, 2020Answer
Date: July 20, 2020Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: June 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 14, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 21, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: June 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 16, 2020Notice
Date: June 29, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 03, 2020Case Management and Trial Setting Statement
Date: May 24, 2023Discovery Conference
Date: March 23, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: April 15, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: November 09, 2020Discovery Conference
Date: April 19, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: May 26, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 02, 2022Stipulation & Order
Date: November 12, 2020Case Management and Trial Setting Statement
Date: November 29, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 17, 2021Discovery Conference
Date: May 13, 2021Discovery Conference
Date: July 08, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: July 15, 2022Discovery Conference
Date: March 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 05, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 15, 2020Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: September 11, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 06, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 03, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 24, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 09, 2020Affidavit of Mailing
Date: September 17, 2020Case Management and Trial Setting Conference Statement (4.5.24 CMC)
Date: March 21, 2024Case Management and Trial Setting Conf. Statement (4.15.2022) 4879-1327-5674 v.1
Date: April 06, 20222268399_Learnship_Defend_tatement_2024_01_05_
Date: December 27, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference Statement (12.02.22)
Date: November 18, 20222129386 Learnship - Defendants' CM and Trial Setting Conf Statement (2022.12.02)1 (002)
Date: November 29, 20222189524_Learnship_Defend_tatement_2023_05_26_
Date: May 24, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: August 20, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: January 05, 2024Informal Discovery Conference
Date: August 16, 2021Discovery Conference
Date: February 09, 2021Case Management Order
Date: September 17, 2020Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: January 27, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference Statement (3.10.23 CMC)
Date: February 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | 2304710_Learnship_Defend_ment_2024_04_05_CMC_ | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management and Trial Setting Statement | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management and Trial Setting Conference Statement (4.5.24 CMC) | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of CMC and TSC - Endorsed Copy Notice of Case Management Conference |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video Jason Y. Wu |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Case Management and Trial Setting Conference 01/05/2024 Case Management and Trial Setting Conference Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Statement DEFENDANTS AND CROSS COMPLAINANTS LEARNSHIP CORPORATION Case Management and Trial Setting Statement DEFENDANTS AND CROSS COMPLAINANTS LEARNSHIP CORPORATION AND LEARNSHIP NETWORKS GMBH'S CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT |
|
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | 2268399_Learnship_Defend_tatement_2024_01_05_ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.