Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Commercial Collection Service, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jeffrey, Thomas F., against Cm And Sg, Llc, Does 1 - 20, Ramaciotti, Charles, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoiles, Robert D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
Category(09) Unlimited Other Collections |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 08, 2020Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes
Date: February 03, 2021Complaint
Date: December 20, 2019Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: July 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2027 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal 2/23/27 Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal 2/23/27 |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 7/29/20 Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 7/29/20 |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.