Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lorian, Patrick, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kaufman, Scott R., against Does 1 - 20, Inclusive, Volvo Case Usa, Llc, represented by Henderson, Austin R., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with John L. Grandsaert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Grandsaert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is filed by Patrick Lorian against Volvo Cars of North America LLC and Does 1-20. The complaint alleges breach of express warranties and breach of implied warranties. Patrick Lorian purchased a new 2019 Volvo XC90 for $65,451.49 in Jul...
Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 15, 2020Request For Dismissal
Date: August 27, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: April 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: April 02, 2020Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: June 01, 2020Complaint
Date: December 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal 9/29/20 |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 7/22/20 Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 7/22/20 |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees | |
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT; NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT BY PL Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT; NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT BY PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.