Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pico, Elaine, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Donig, Reuben J., against County Of San Mateo, Does 1 To 25, San Mateo County Office Of Education, State Of California, represented by Rosenthal, Karen, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Buchwald, Gerald J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBuchwald, Gerald J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2019 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a personal injury and property damage case filed by Elaine Pico against the County of San Mateo, San Mateo County Office of Education, and the State of California. The complaint alleges that the defendants' actions caused damages to...
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: September 10, 2021POS Notice of Nonagreement
Date: January 20, 2022Statement of Nonagreement
Date: January 20, 202256183Notic0025c7
Date: April 13, 2022PICO Request for Dismissal with POS
Date: May 06, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal with POS
Date: May 10, 2022Pico Filed Request for Dismissal
Date: May 10, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 10, 2021Exhibit List
Date: September 03, 2021Evidence
Date: June 04, 2021Declaration in Opposition
Date: October 28, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: October 28, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 03, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: September 10, 2021Motion for Judgment
Date: September 17, 2021Order
Date: September 22, 2021Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion
Date: September 03, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: September 03, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: September 03, 2021Notice of Errata
Date: September 03, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 03, 2021Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: June 04, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: June 04, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: June 04, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 04, 2021Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes
Date: February 03, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 21, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 10, 2020CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.
Date: December 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 01, 2020Answer
Date: November 20, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 03, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 24, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 30, 2020Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 28, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: September 01, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 01, 2020Demurrer to Amended Complaint
Date: September 01, 2020Case Management Order
Date: July 10, 2020First Amended Complaint
Date: July 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 25, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 30, 2020Complaint
Date: December 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal with POS | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Pico Filed Request for Dismissal | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PICO Request for Dismissal with POS | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | 56183Notic0025c7 | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | POS Notice of Nonagreement | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Nonagreement | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mail returned undelivered (unscanned) Document: ADR Evaluation Reason: Return to sender "Wrong Schneider" |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Type: DENYING DEFENDANT COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATI Order Type: DENYING DEFENDANT COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION Signed by: JUDGE FOILES Date Signed: 9/22/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.