Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Clark, Deirdre, filed a(n) (24) Unlimited Product Liability case against 3M Company Et. Al, Does 1 To 10, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
Category(24) Unlimited Product Liability |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Order
Date: July 09, 2020Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 09, 2020Order to Show Cause
Date: November 12, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: March 08, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 11, 2019Summons Issued / Filed
Date: December 11, 2019Fee Waiver Granted
Date: December 11, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 11, 2019CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: December 03, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 22, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: February 10, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 02, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 08, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 14, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: October 19, 2021Affidavit of Mailing
Date: November 12, 2021Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: December 14, 2021CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: October 01, 2020Order
Date: December 14, 2021Affidavit of Mailing
Date: July 09, 2020Affidavit of Mailing
Date: December 14, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: June 14, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 02, 2021Complaint
Date: December 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 12/14/2021 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action Lack of Prosecution Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Order Dismissing Entire Action without Prejudice for Delay in Prosecution Order Dismissing Entire Action without Prejudice for Delay in Prosecution |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing Order Dismissing Entire Action without Prejudice for Delay in Prosecution Affidavit of Mailing Order Dismissing Entire Action without Prejudice for Delay in Prosecution |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay in Prosecution signe Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay in Prosecution signed by Commissioner Halperin, Department 34 |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay Affidavit of Mailing Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay in Prosecution signed by Commissioner Halperin, Department 34 |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/19/2021 Case Management Conference Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 10/19/2021 at 10:00 a.m. Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 10/19/2021 at 10:00 a.m. |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/14/2021 Case Management Conference Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video Added by automated script |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 6/14/2021 at 9:00 a.m. - SSF Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 6/14/2021 at 9:00 a.m. - SSF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.