Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pawnee Leasing Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ferns, Barry W., against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Dominguez, Hipolito, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with DuBois, Richard H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDuBois, Richard H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2019 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Mateo. The plaintiff, Pawnee Leasing Corporation, is suing the defendants, Hipolito Dominguez aka Hipolito Dominguez Guzman dba 11X Bady Collisio...
Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: February 18, 2020Default Judgment by Court
Date: February 25, 2020Request to Enter Default
Date: February 05, 2020Request For
Date: February 18, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 10, 2019Proposed Judgment Received
Date: February 18, 2020Summons Issued / Filed
Date: December 10, 2019Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: January 06, 2020Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: February 18, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 10, 2019Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: December 09, 2020Declaration
Date: December 09, 2020Writ of Execution Return
Date: December 22, 2020Declaration
Date: February 18, 2020Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment
Date: February 18, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: May 29, 2020Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: December 09, 2020Complaint
Date: December 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of SAN MATEO Issued On: 2/22/2021 Amount: $40,587.53 |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of LOS ANGELES Issued On: 2/22/2021 Amount: $40,587.53 |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: Partially SatisfiedIssued on: 05/29/2020Amoun Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELES Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 05/29/2020 Amount: $35,452.18 |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Accrued Interest | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration RE: ATTORNEY FEES Declaration RE: ATTORNEY FEES |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: 2,978.50 Credit: 0.00 Interest: 2,161.85 |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of LOS ANGELES Issued On: 05/29/20 Amount: $35,452.18 |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued Amount: $35,407.18 |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.