Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
American Technologies, Inc, Grand Century Secured Investments, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, Migdal, Anetta Kalk, Migdal, Mark, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Morger, Steven M, against Amco Insurance Company, An Iowa Corporation, American Technologies, Inc., A California Corporation, Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, represented by Curran, James D., Martin, Sonia Renee, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2019 |
Category(18) Unlimited Insurance Coverage |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiffs Mark Migdal, Anetta Kalk Migdal, and Grand Century Secured Investments, LLC against Defendants AMCO Insurance Company and American Technologies, Inc. The Plaintiffs allege various claims including breach of the i...
Declaration in Support
Date: September 21, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 05, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 17, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion for Joinder
Date: November 04, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: November 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 17, 2020Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: January 19, 2021Complaint
Date: September 17, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 08, 2020Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: November 15, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 01, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: September 21, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 08, 2020Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: February 11, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 14, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 21, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 09, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: November 05, 2020Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: March 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 18, 2020Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: February 22, 2021Objections to Evidence
Date: November 10, 2020Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay
Date: November 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 21, 2020Joinder
Date: November 13, 2020Order
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: November 05, 2020Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: May 26, 2021Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: June 23, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 25, 2021Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: July 21, 20212022-05-23 Notice of Acceptance - unfiled
Date: May 23, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 03, 2020Summons Issued / Filed
Date: September 17, 2019Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: October 30, 2020Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: September 23, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 17, 2020Affidavit of Mailing
Date: July 15, 2020Order After Hearing
Date: December 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: February 13, 2020Discovery Conference
Date: September 15, 2020Notice
Date: November 20, 2020Association of Counsel / Attorney
Date: September 15, 2020ADR Referral
Date: December 21, 2020Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: June 22, 2021Discovery Conference
Date: October 26, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 29, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: September 21, 2020Discovery Conference
Date: November 10, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: November 10, 2020Discovery Conference
Date: December 03, 2020Notice
Date: November 20, 2020Discovery Conference
Date: November 20, 2020Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: November 09, 2021Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: July 21, 2021Affidavit of Mailing
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: June 09, 2021Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal
Date: March 12, 2021Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: May 03, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 09, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: June 09, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: June 09, 2021CCP 998 Offer to Compromise
Date: May 23, 2022Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: June 06, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 17, 2019Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: January 15, 2020Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: November 12, 2021Notice of Entry of Order
Date: January 04, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 08, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: December 04, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: November 05, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 05, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: November 10, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: October 30, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 30, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: October 30, 2020Cross Complaint
Date: November 15, 2019Case Management Order
Date: July 15, 202063341Reque008a8b
Date: September 13, 20222022-10-18 Notice - unfiled
Date: October 18, 20222022-10-18 JPG Dec - unfiled
Date: October 18, 20222022-10-18 Proposed Order
Date: October 18, 20222022-11-30 Dismissal - unfiled
Date: November 30, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 15, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 15, 2020Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: January 08, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: November 15, 2019Answer (Unlimited)
Date: October 21, 2019Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: September 23, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 17, 2019Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-11-30 Dismissal - unfiled | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-10-18 Notice - unfiled | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-10-18 JPG Dec - unfiled | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-10-18 Proposed Order | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | 63341Reque008a8b | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial hearing
Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-06-06 Notice of Settlement - unfiled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.