Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mazariegos, Jaime E, filed a(n) (24) Unlimited Product Liability case represented by Collins, James P., against Does 1 To 50, Does 51 To 150, Inclusive, Koki Holdings America Ltd., Koki Holdings Co., Ltd., represented by Bamshad, Anita, Kliebenstein, Neil M., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2019 |
Category(24) Unlimited Product Liability |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case. The plaintiff, Jaime E. Mazariegos, individually, is suing KOKI HOLDINGS CO., LTD., a foreign corporation, and KOKI HOLDINGS AMERICA LTD., a Georgia corporation. The compl...
Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 13, 2020Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to
Date: November 12, 2019Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 13, 2020Motion to Intervene
Date: December 03, 2019Order
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes
Date: February 03, 2021Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: March 17, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: February 19, 2020Request For Dismissal
Date: June 03, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 08, 2021Request For Dismissal
Date: June 03, 2021Complaint
Date: September 16, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: December 05, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: February 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 10, 2020Complaint in Intervention
Date: December 05, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 08, 2020Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: February 24, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: December 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 26, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: August 07, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: February 19, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: August 10, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: August 07, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash
Date: August 07, 2020Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: April 21, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 07, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: January 25, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: December 11, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 07, 2020Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 10, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 10, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 02, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: December 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 01, 2021Declaration in Opposition
Date: December 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 03, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 06, 2020Order
Date: September 28, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: October 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND'S COMPLAINT Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND'S COMPLAINT |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO ENTIRE ACTION |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC Re: Dismissal - 8/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m. - SSF Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC Re: Dismissal - 8/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m. - SSF |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case COPY TO DEPT 34 Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case COPY TO DEPT 34 |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video Added by automated script |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 02/22/2021 Case Management Conference Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.