Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Zhang, Mei-Fang Lisa, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Cooke, Christopher C., against Does 1-20, Inclusive, Leung, Bernard Chi-Fai, Lun & Associates, Lun, Wendy, Tse, Joseph, (total of 5) See All represented by Rand, Benjamin, Tse, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with John L. Grandsaert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Grandsaert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 01, 2019 |
Category(07) Unlimited Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Mei-Fang Lisa Zhang against Bernard Leung, Joseph Tse, Wendy Lun & Associates, and Does 1-20. Zhang alleges intentional interference with prospective economic advantage, breach of fiduciary duty, defamation...
Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: August 28, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 09, 2020Declaration
Date: August 25, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 25, 2020Demurrer to Amended Complaint
Date: July 09, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 13, 2020Request For Dismissal
Date: August 28, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 25, 2020Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: August 24, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 12, 2020Case Management Order
Date: July 07, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: May 28, 2020Demurrer to
Date: February 13, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: January 27, 2020Ex Parte Order
Date: October 08, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: January 13, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: January 13, 2020Stipulation
Date: October 08, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 08, 2019Application
Date: October 08, 2019Complaint
Date: August 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Tentative ruling adopted and becomes order: DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS This matter is dropped from calendar as moot. A dismissal was filed on August 28, 2020. If the tentative ruling is uncontested, it shall become the order of the Court, pursuant to Rule 3.1308(a)(1), adopted by Local Rule 3.10, effective immediately, and no formal order pursuant to Rule 3.1312 or any other notice is required as the tentative ruling affords sufficient notice to the parties. |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video Added by automated script |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Hearing on Demurrer 09/08/2020 Hearing on Demurrer Judge: Greenberg, Susan |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With PrejudiceENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF CHRISTOPHER COOKE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSTION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTOR Declaration OF CHRISTOPHER COOKE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSTION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS JOSEPH TSE,WENDY LUN, Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS JOSEPH TSE,WENDY LUN, AND LUN & ASSOCIATES |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSTION TO DEFENDANTS;MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES;DECL Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSTION TO DEFENDANTS;MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES;DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER COOKE IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.