Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Safeamerica Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ferns, Barry W, against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Hansen, Jacob Lee, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Greenberg, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2019 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Dec re Atty Fees
Date: November 08, 2022Dec re Acc%
Date: November 08, 2022Memo of Cost
Date: November 08, 2022Complaint
Date: February 13, 2019Declaration of Venue
Date: February 13, 2019Notice
Date: February 26, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 13, 2019Writ of Possession
Date: April 10, 2019Notice of Continuance
Date: June 24, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 04, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 24, 2019Hearing on Demurrer
Date: September 27, 2019Order
Date: September 04, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: August 26, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: October 04, 2019Summary
Date: December 13, 2019Summons Issued / Filed
Date: February 13, 2019Declaration Supporting Attorney Fees
Date: December 13, 2019Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment
Date: December 13, 2019Request to Enter Default
Date: December 13, 2019Writ of Possession
Date: August 06, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: August 12, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 22, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: May 21, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 12, 2019Objection
Date: July 22, 2019Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: June 24, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 13, 2019Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: April 25, 2019Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing
Date: February 26, 2019Proposed Order Received
Date: February 26, 2019Request to Enter Default
Date: October 17, 2019Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing
Date: June 24, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 29, 2019Demurrer and First Appearance Fee to
Date: May 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Dec re Atty Fees | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Dec re Acc% | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Memo of Cost | |
November 07, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: HONORABLE V. RAYMOND SWOPE, Department 23 2:00 SAFEAMERICA CREDIT UNION VS. JACOB LEE HANSEN, ET AL. SAFEAMERICA CREDIT UNION BARRY W. FERNS JACOB LEE HANSEN PRO SE MOTION FOR POST JUDGMENT ATT...
Judge: HONORABLE V. RAYMOND SWOPE |
|
August 08, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: HONORABLE V. RAYMOND SWOPE, Department 23 SAFEAMERICA CREDIT UNION VS. JACOB LEE HANSEN, ET AL. SAFEAMERICA CREDIT UNION BARRY W. FERNS JACOB LEE HANSEN PRO/PER MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES BY DEFE...
Judge: HONORABLE V. RAYMOND SWOPE |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summary CASE SUMMARY Summary CASE SUMMARY |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration Supporting Attorney Fees | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 585 Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 585 |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 5/13/20 Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 5/13/20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.