Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Villatoro David Israel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Villatoro Jazmin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with James V. Selna presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJuly 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2023 | Certificate of Completion - Between Two Parents | ||
March 21, 2023 | Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order | ||
March 20, 2023 | Minute Order as Order After Hearing | ||
March 20, 2023 | Minute Order | ||
March 16, 2023 | Post-Judgment Request for Order Case Mgmt Statement FAM 119 | ||
March 08, 2023 | Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 | ||
March 08, 2023 | Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing - denied | ||
March 08, 2023 | Request - Continue Hearing - Sent to courtroom | ||
March 03, 2023 | FCS-Mediation Memo | ||
February 23, 2023 | Proof of Service - POS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.