Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Titan Investments Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Klingerman Cris A, against Choy Ana Aka Ana E. Choy Aka Ana Elsa Choy, Rubio Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts West Covina with Susan Jung Townsend presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2018 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Residential (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseWest Covina |
Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Alexander Rubio (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Titan Investments, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ana Choy (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Writ of Possession (Mailed); Issued and Filed by: Titan Investments, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Default entered as to Alexander Rubio; On the Complaint filed by Titan Investments, Inc. on
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Order Denying Post Judgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 02, 2018Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Titan Investments, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1 - 10
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Default entered as to Ana Choy; Alexander Rubio; On the Complaint filed by Titan Investments, Inc. on
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Jose L. Cervantes (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Default entered as to Ana Choy; On the Complaint filed by Titan Investments, Inc. on
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Titan Investments, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Summons - on Complaint
Date: April 26, 2018Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice
Date: April 26, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: April 26, 2018Complaint
Date: April 26, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 26, 2018Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Ana Choy)
Date: April 27, 2018Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)
Date: April 27, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 02, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: May 02, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - [Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession]
Date: May 07, 2018Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession
Date: May 07, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 08, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 15, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 01, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: June 01, 2018Writ of (name extension) - Possession (Mailed)
Date: June 06, 2018Application for Writ of Possession
Date: June 06, 2018Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: June 06, 2018Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing
Date: June 27, 2018Order Denying Post Judgment Claim of Right to Possession
Date: July 02, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Right to Possession (Arrieta))
Date: July 02, 2018Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment
Date: July 02, 2018Writ - Return
Date: July 30, 2018Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Alexander Rubio (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Jose L. Cervantes (Arrieta Claimant)
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Default entered as to Ana Choy; On the Complaint filed by Titan Investments, Inc. on 04/26/2018
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Titan Investments, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Writ of Possession (Mailed); Issued and Filed by: Titan Investments, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Default entered as to Alexander Rubio; On the Complaint filed by Titan Investments, Inc. on 04/26/2018
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Titan Investments, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ana Choy (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.