Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Forwardline Financial Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Blanda Jon Omar, against Taylor And Sons Constructions Llc Dba Taylor And Sons Construction, Taylor Paul, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys East with Shirley K. Watkins presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management129 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 26, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions174 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys East |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC on
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodging lodging; Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: October 26, 2018Complaint
Date: October 26, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 26, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 26, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 29, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: November 08, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 26, 2018Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: November 26, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 26, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: March 04, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: April 23, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 13, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 14, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: September 10, 2019Stipulation for Judgment
Date: November 12, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: November 12, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING LODGING
Date: September 23, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: September 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL AND ENTER JUDGMENT PURS...)
Date: November 04, 2020Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] RE: MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL CCP 664.6 AND ENTER JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: February 03, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED]
Date: January 04, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: July 28, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: August 23, 2022Writ - Return
Date: September 12, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (lodging) Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Dismissal and Enter Judgment Purs...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Dismissal and Enter Judgment Purs...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: August 23, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Writ - Return Filed by Clerk
Date: September 12, 2022Declaration of Mailing Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice (notice of hearing) Filed by Forwardline Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment))
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Does 1 through 100, inclusive)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment))
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (lodging)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice (notice of hearing)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Dismissal and Enter Judgment Purs...))
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment))
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.