Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Plb Management Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Block Dennis Paul, against Arnette Mario, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2018 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Residential (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: PLB Management, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Johanna Anderson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Angelica Stevenson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Angelica Stevenson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Marcus Bill (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Mario Arnette (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Marcus Bill (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PLB Management, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: PLB Management, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Mario Arnette (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Worksheet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Angelica Stevenson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL - Minute Order; Filed by: As to: Angelica Stevenson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by: PLB Management, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Mario Arnette (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Johanna Anderson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: PLB Management, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 98.77
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Marcus Bill (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Mario Arnette (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Johanna Anderson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: February 16, 2018Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice
Date: February 16, 2018Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)
Date: February 16, 2018Complaint
Date: February 16, 2018Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Mario Arnette)
Date: February 16, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 16, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: February 16, 2018Answer
Date: February 22, 2018Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: February 22, 2018Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial
Date: March 05, 2018Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial
Date: March 07, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 12, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 12, 2018Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: March 23, 2018Minute Order - (COURT TRIAL-FAILURE TO APPEAR)
Date: March 23, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: March 23, 2018Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: March 29, 2018Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession
Date: March 29, 2018Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession
Date: April 03, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 03, 2018Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Angelica Stevenson is stricken
Date: April 03, 2018Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: April 03, 2018Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: April 06, 2018Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: April 11, 2018Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing
Date: April 19, 2018Minute Order - (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE AND/OR...)
Date: April 20, 2018Ex Parte Application (name extension)
Date: April 20, 2018Motion for Order (name extension)
Date: April 20, 2018Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: April 24, 2018Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
Date: April 20, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 24, 2018Application for Writ of Possession
Date: April 24, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: April 24, 2018Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order
Date: April 27, 2018Writ - Return
Date: July 03, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)
Date: October 22, 2018Answer; Filed by: Mario Arnette (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Johanna Anderson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by: PLB Management, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: PLB Management, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Mario Arnette (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Mario Arnette (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: PLB Management, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Mario Arnette (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Angelica Stevenson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PLB Management, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Marcus Bill (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Johanna Anderson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Johanna Anderson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Marcus Bill (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Angelica Stevenson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL 04/20/18 - Minute Order; Filed by: As to: Angelica Stevenson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Marcus Bill (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Angelica Stevenson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.