Kosayan Serop,
filed a(n)
General Small Claims -
Small Claims
case
against
Jones Cary Alexander,
Wakita Sayo Aka Sayo Jones,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
with Philip K. Mautino presiding.
Case Details for
Kosayan Serop v. Jones Cary Alexander
, et al.
Case Events for
Kosayan Serop v. Jones Cary Alexander
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
November 08, 2018
Docket Event
On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Serop Kosayan on 10/04/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Serop Kosayan as to the entire action
November 08, 2018
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Serop Kosayan (Plaintiff)
November 08, 2018
Docket Event
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/12/2018 in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/08/2018
October 04, 2018
Docket Event
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Serop Kosayan (Plaintiff); As to: Sayo Wakita (Defendant); Cary Alexander Jones (Defendant)
October 04, 2018
Docket Event
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/12/2018 in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
October 04, 2018
Docket Event
Case assigned to Hon. Philip K. Mautino in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse