Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rojas Carmela, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against City Of Los Angeles, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Philip K. Mautino presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 28, 2018Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Carmela Rojas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Carmela Rojas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: July 24, 2018Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court
Date: July 24, 2018Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
Date: August 09, 2018Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)
Date: September 17, 2018Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: September 17, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/17/2018
Date: September 17, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs - Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
Date: November 28, 2018Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Carmela Rojas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/17/2018; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Carmela Rojas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk | |
November 28, 2018 | Hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant) | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Carmela Rojas against Defendant City of Los Angeles on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Carmela Rojas on for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $5,115.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $115.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant City of Los Angeles. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638. | |
November 28, 2018 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | ||
November 28, 2018 | Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs - Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs | ||
November 28, 2018 | Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) | ||
November 28, 2018 | Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) | ||
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk; As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.