Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Crystal Edward, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Frangipane Amy Aka Amy Christina Craham, Graham Sean, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Ray A. Santana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)
Date: September 06, 2018Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
Date: September 06, 2018Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
Date: September 06, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: November 13, 2018Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/13/2018; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 13, 2018Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Edward Crystal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.