We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Oportun Inc. ,
filed a(n)
General Small Claims -
Small Claims
case
against
Canchola Gutierrez Jaime Alejandro ,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
with Kenji Machida presiding.
Filing Date
April 03, 2018
Category
Small Claims (Limited Jurisdiction)
Last Refreshed
March 01, 2021
Practice Area
Small Claims
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Defendants
Canchola Gutierrez Jaime Alejandro
Case Events for
Oportun Inc. v. Canchola Gutierrez Jaime Alejandro
Date
Type
Description
May 31, 2018
Docket Event
Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/31/2018; Filed by: Clerk
Get Document
May 31, 2018
Docket Event
Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
May 31, 2018
Docket Event
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2018 in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 05/31/2018; Result Type to Held
May 31, 2018
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)
Get Document
May 31, 2018
Docket Event
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
Get Document
May 31, 2018
Docket Event
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
April 05, 2018
Docket Event
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2018 in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
April 05, 2018
Docket Event
Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse
April 03, 2018
Docket Event
Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
Get Document
April 03, 2018
Docket Event
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Jaime Alejandro Canchola Gutierrez (Defendant)
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.