Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pizano Yolanda, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Baghdasaryan Narine, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Samantha P. Jessner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Yolanda Pizano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 31, 2019Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
Date: January 29, 2018Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents
Date: January 29, 2018Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court
Date: January 29, 2018Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: March 26, 2018Minute Order - (Amended)
Date: March 26, 2018Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)
Date: March 26, 2018Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: May 22, 2018Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)
Date: May 22, 2018Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
Date: May 22, 2018Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: July 30, 2018Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)
Date: July 30, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: December 19, 2018Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
Date: December 21, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: December 21, 2018Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
Date: March 19, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: March 19, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: May 31, 2019Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: November 19, 2019Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/19/2018; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Yolanda Pizano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.