Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Olson Todd C., Stetz Jeffrey, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Prutow Eric C, Prutow Erin C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Mark S. Priver presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2018 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Minute Order
Date: December 10, 2018Notice - Hearing
Date: January 23, 2019Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)
Date: January 24, 2019Supplement - Re Probate Notes
Date: January 24, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 28, 2019Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)
Date: March 11, 2019Supplement - Supplemental Declaration of Leslie Klein, Esq.
Date: March 12, 2019Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)
Date: March 12, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 15, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 07, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 21, 2019Stipulation - for Continuance of the Post-Mediation Hearing
Date: August 22, 2019Stipulation - Joint Stipulation for Continuance
Date: January 27, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 28, 2020Request - Special Notice
Date: May 07, 2020Joinder - Notice of Joinder to Petition
Date: July 14, 2020Supplement - to Clear Probate Notes
Date: July 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 29, 2020Notice - Hearing
Date: July 30, 2020Order - Appointing Trustee
Date: August 20, 2020Account - Trust (Subsequent) - First Account Current And Report.
Date: October 27, 2020Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing re First Account Current
Date: October 27, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 14, 2020Objection - Trust Petition - Objection to First Trust Account
Date: February 09, 2021Response - Response to Objection
Date: February 16, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 17, 2021Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: May 13, 2021Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order
Date: May 25, 2021Minute Order
Date: May 25, 2021Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continued Hearing Date
Date: June 03, 2021Notice - Ruling - Notice of Hearing
Date: June 03, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 09, 2021Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: July 27, 2021Order
Date: August 09, 2021Order - Approval of Settlement Agreement and Compromise of Claims
Date: September 01, 2021Notice - Ruling - Notice of Entry of Order on Petition for Approval of Settlement Agreement
Date: September 07, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 | Substitution of Attorney | ||
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Personal Representative Filed by Personal Representative |
|
September 28, 2021 | Hearing | ||
September 07, 2021 | Notice - Ruling - Notice of Entry of Order on Petition for Approval of Settlement Agreement | ||
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice - Ruling (Notice of Entry of Order on Petition for Approval of Settlement Agreement ) | |
September 01, 2021 | Order - Approval of Settlement Agreement and Compromise of Claims | ||
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order (Approval of Settlement Agreement and Compromise of Claims ) | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Rejected Proposed Order | |
August 09, 2021 | Order | ||
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.