Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Korkes Wendi, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Benz William G, Carico Christopher Daniel, Morton Amber Nicole, against Schwartz Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Barbara R. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2018 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time417 days |
Minute Order
Date: August 08, 2022Minute Order
Date: January 20, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 30, 2022Minute Order
Date: June 15, 2023Minute Order
Date: June 01, 2023Notice - Hearing
Date: September 04, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 08, 2018Notice - Hearing
Date: November 08, 2018Notice - Hearing
Date: December 06, 2018Consent - Consent to Serve as Successor Trustee
Date: December 06, 2018Request - Of Current Beneficiary To Waive Bond If Professional Fiduciary is Appointed
Date: December 07, 2018Objection - Trust Petition - Objection - Trust Petition
Date: January 16, 2019Minute Order - Account - Trust (Subsequent) filed on November 7, 2018 by Wendi Korkes.
Date: January 17, 2019Objection - Trust Petition - Objection - Trust Petition
Date: June 21, 2019Notice - Related Cases
Date: June 04, 2019Notice - Notice of Beneficiary Consent to Accounting
Date: July 10, 2019Notice - Hearing
Date: August 06, 2019Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continued Hearings
Date: August 28, 2019Supplement - First Supplement to Petition for Approval
Date: October 10, 2019Minute Order - Account - Trust (Subsequent) filed on November 7, 2018 by Melissa Schwartz.
Date: October 21, 2019Notice - Notice of Entry of Order
Date: November 14, 2019Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - for Instructions
Date: September 02, 2021Ex Parte - Application - [09/07/2021] Shortening Time
Date: September 02, 2021Ex Parte Opposition - $60
Date: September 03, 2021Ex Parte - Order
Date: September 08, 2021Minute Order
Date: September 22, 2021Notice - Ruling
Date: September 27, 2021Notice - Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Continuance of Hearing
Date: January 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2024 | Hearing |
Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Trust 17200 Hearing |
|
January 04, 2024 | Hearing |
Probate Department MSC 250A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Mandatory Settlement Conference |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Ruling (Notice of Ruling and Notice of MSC and Hearing re 17200 Petition ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 07, 2023 | Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Notice of MSC and Hearing re 17200 Petition | ||
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Rosenbloom Jonathan L |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Respondent |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | MSC - Not Held | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.