Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Department Of Health Care Services, Hays Richard A, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Lehn Richard Anton, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Brenda Penny presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2018 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time788 days |
Minute Order
Date: November 21, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 28, 2019Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)
Date: July 06, 2018Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication
Date: July 20, 2018Supplement - Letters of Administration
Date: July 31, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 06, 2018Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative
Date: August 09, 2018Letters (Initial) - ADMINISTRATOR WITH LIMITED AUTHORITY
Date: August 23, 2018Bond - US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: August 23, 2018Creditor's Claim
Date: September 18, 2018Creditor's Claim
Date: September 24, 2018Request - Special Notice (No Fee)
Date: September 24, 2018Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice - Administration to Creditors
Date: October 09, 2018Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice - Administration to Creditors
Date: October 22, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: November 01, 2018Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal- Final
Date: November 02, 2018Disclaimer - Disclaimer
Date: November 02, 2018Notice - Proposed Action - Notice of Proposed Action
Date: February 22, 2019Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal- Supplemental
Date: June 05, 2019Request - Special Notice (No Fee)
Date: June 20, 2019Inventory & Appraisal - Reappraisal for sale
Date: July 12, 2019Petition - Report and Confirmation of Sale
Date: August 07, 2019Status Report of Personal Representative - Status Report of Personal Representative
Date: August 19, 2019Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: August 23, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 06, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 09, 2019Order - Confirming Sale
Date: September 13, 2019Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing
Date: September 26, 2019Supplement - Supplement
Date: October 24, 2019Supplement - Supplement To OCS
Date: November 20, 2019Citation
Date: December 11, 2019Proof of Service
Date: December 11, 2019Supplement
Date: January 09, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 13, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 24, 2020Order
Date: January 29, 2020Inventory & Appraisal - Supplemental
Date: February 13, 2020Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Creditor : Bank Of America
Date: February 13, 2020Account - Final or Waiver - First And Final Account And Report, Distribution.
Date: February 13, 2020Minute Order
Date: March 02, 2020Notice - Hearing
Date: March 12, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 24, 2020Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance
Date: May 22, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 28, 2020Order - Approving Final Account/No Successor Appointed
Date: August 03, 2020Order - Approving Final Account/No Successor Appointed
Date: August 07, 2020Receipt - Receipt
Date: August 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | TERM: Approval of Final Distribution | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Receipt (Receipt ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 27, 2020 | Receipt - Receipt | ||
August 27, 2020 | Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order - Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order | ||
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Receipt (Receipt ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Receipt (Receipt ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Order - Approving Final Account/No Successor Appointed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.