Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ahl Deborah, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Guzman Denise Mancillas, Keesey Deborah Chen, against Ortega Linda, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark S. Priver presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2018 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time432 days |
Minute Order
Date: October 11, 2018Notice - Hearing
Date: June 12, 2018Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner
Date: August 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 17, 2019Notice - Hearing
Date: March 14, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 14, 2019Supplement - Supplement One to Petition for Approval of Settlement Agreement
Date: May 16, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 23, 2019Supplement - Supplement Two to Petition for Approval of Settlement Agreement
Date: June 13, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 29, 2019Notice - Hearing
Date: June 21, 2019Order - Approving Settlement Agreement
Date: August 02, 2019Supplement - Supplement
Date: August 27, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 30, 2019Bond
Date: October 08, 2019Order
Date: October 08, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 07, 2020Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name/Address
Date: August 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name (Notice of Change of Firm Name/Address ) Filed by Respondent |
|
August 05, 2021 | Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name/Address | ||
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney |
|
April 07, 2020 | Substitution of Attorney | ||
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Bond Filed by Respondent |
|
October 08, 2019 | Bond | ||
October 08, 2019 | Order | ||
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Rejected Proposed Order | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.