Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cueto Raul Martinez, Emmanuel Kevin, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case represented by Brooks Zev Shalom, Pranata Theresa Marie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Ana Maria Luna presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2018 |
CategoryGuardianship (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time414 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2023 | Hearing |
Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Hearing |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held Judge: Rosenbloom Jonathan L |
|
October 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel Filed by Minor |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 11, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar Judge: Rosenbloom Jonathan L |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Minor |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.