Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ubs Bank Usa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donohue Devin Anthony, against Beneke Krystine, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy W. Y. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 09, 2018 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: October 09, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 09, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: October 09, 2018Complaint
Date: October 09, 2018Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 16, 2019Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Default
Date: May 23, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: August 20, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 20, 2019Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: September 10, 2019Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: November 01, 2019Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: January 06, 2020Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
Date: May 04, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: September 27, 2021Default entered as to Krystine Beneke; On the Complaint filed by UBS Bank USA on 10/09/2018
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: UBS Bank USA (Plaintiff); As to: Krystine Beneke (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: UBS Bank USA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Default; Filed by: UBS Bank USA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Default entered as to Krystine Beneke; On the Complaint filed by UBS Bank USA on 10/09/2018
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: UBS Bank USA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: UBS Bank USA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Default Judgment; Signed and Filed by: UBS Bank USA (Plaintiff); As to: Krystine Beneke (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: UBS Bank USA (Plaintiff); As to: Krystine Beneke (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 23, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.