Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jamal Bill, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Petersen Richard Patrick, against Bent Leonard Rene Aka Cooking With Lenny'S Catering, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Doreen B. Boxer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDoreen B. Boxer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time784 days |
Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Default entered as to Leonard Rene Bent; On the Complaint filed by Bill Jamal on
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff); As to: Leonard Rene Bent (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Default entered as to Leonard Rene Bent; On the Complaint filed by Bill Jamal on
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort; Filed by:
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Request CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Default Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff); As to: Leonard Rene Bent (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 02, 2023Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 01, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 09, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: October 09, 2018Complaint
Date: October 09, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: October 09, 2018Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 18, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 13, 2018Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: April 04, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 04, 2019Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: June 26, 2019Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
Date: August 02, 2019Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: November 07, 2019Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: April 03, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 21, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: August 05, 2020Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: August 10, 2020Order (name extension) - Order ORDER ADDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS TO JUDGMENT
Date: September 02, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
Date: September 10, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice OF RULING AND CONTINUANCE OF DEBTOR EXAMINATION
Date: September 18, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
Date: December 01, 2020Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: February 01, 2023Writ - Return - Writ - Return No Writ Attachment Received
Date: February 01, 2023Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: February 02, 2023Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
Date: February 03, 2023Default Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff); As to: Leonard Rene Bent (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Request CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Default entered as to Leonard Rene Bent; On the Complaint filed by Bill Jamal on 10/09/2018
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Default entered as to Leonard Rene Bent; On the Complaint filed by Bill Jamal on 10/09/2018
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff); As to: Leonard Rene Bent (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort; Filed by:
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Bill Jamal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.