Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Flexi-Van Leasing Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Booska Steven A., Goodman Howard, against Ram Logistics Llc., Sharma Vibhu Mohan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Upinder S. Kalra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUpinder S. Kalra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2018 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees; Filed by: Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: May 24, 2021Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Default entered as to Ram Logistics LLC. On the Complaint filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. on
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 04, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: October 04, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: October 04, 2018Complaint
Date: October 04, 2018Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 20, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 06, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: November 06, 2019Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: January 10, 2020Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
Date: January 24, 2020Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: August 13, 2020Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles )
Date: December 11, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
Date: February 23, 2021Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 24, 2021Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: July 20, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Default entered as to Ram Logistics LLC. On the Complaint filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. on 10/04/2018
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees; Filed by: Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: May 24, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.