Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
Chang Sung Tae, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Lee Henry Min, against Ouyang David, represented by Abellada Jackielyn Holly, Shaw Stephen Michael, Suppa Paul Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff); As to: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant); As to: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 20, 2021Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 20, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 21, 2021Exhibit List; Filed by: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: October 01, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 01, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: October 01, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: October 01, 2018Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 13, 2018Answer - Answer
Date: November 21, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 26, 2018Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: April 10, 2019Witness List - Witness List
Date: March 17, 2020Exhibit List - Exhibit List
Date: March 17, 2020Witness List - Witness List
Date: October 15, 2021Exhibit List - Exhibit List
Date: October 15, 2021Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: October 18, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)
Date: October 18, 2021Notice of Change of Handling Attorney - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: October 18, 2021Trial Brief - Trial Brief
Date: October 18, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: October 18, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: October 18, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
Date: October 19, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: October 19, 2021Judgment - Judgment
Date: October 20, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
Date: October 20, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: October 29, 2021Complaint; Filed by: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff); As to: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: David Ouyang (Defendant); As to: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Sung Tae Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/20/2021; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.