Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Harco National Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by He Shan Sindy, against Sendelbach James Aka James Sendelbech, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2018 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Default entered as to James Sendelbach; On the Complaint filed by Harco National Insurance Company on
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: James Sendelbach (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 20, 2020Default entered as to James Sendelbach; On the Complaint filed by Harco National Insurance Company on
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: July 23, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 23, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: July 23, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: July 23, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 29, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 02, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: May 21, 2019Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
Date: July 02, 2019Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Jmt Debtor Exam
Date: May 20, 2020Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: July 14, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
Date: February 11, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: James Sendelbach (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.