Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Teglas Zoltan Emory, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Norman John Lee, against Gossett Brian Jeffrey, represented by Trafton Alan Paul, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2018 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedAugust 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 11, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: January 11, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: January 11, 2018Complaint
Date: January 11, 2018Notice (name extension) - of deposit of jury fees
Date: May 09, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 16, 2018Answer
Date: May 09, 2018Demand for Jury Trial
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: September 12, 2018Order (name extension) - Order [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: July 08, 2019Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: January 07, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: February 10, 2020Notice of deposit of jury fees; Filed by: Brian Jeffrey Gossett (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Zoltan Emory Teglas (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Jeffrey Gossett (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Zoltan Emory Teglas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Brian Jeffrey Gossett (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Brian Jeffrey Gossett (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Alan Paul Trafton (Attorney)
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 07, 2020Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Zoltan Emory Teglas (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.