Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Qiao Yu, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Zhang Zhizhen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 24, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions62 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time84 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure Filed by Respondent |
|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.